Financial history ST MARTIN'S SCHOOL (NAWTON) TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 529629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £26.24k £25.08k £33.70k £35.88k £38.61k
Total expenditure £29.35k £22.42k £60.10k £35.89k £93.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A