CROSBY HALL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates a residential educational centre for children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 24 March 1988: Standard registration
- C H E T (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MARK BLUNDELL | Chair |
|
||||||
ADAM JAMES WALKER | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|||||
FRED COWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLARE BAXTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE DALY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £400.58k | £225.03k | £430.78k | £419.81k | £444.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £403.81k | £255.13k | £305.67k | £401.43k | £421.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £111.10k | £25.27k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR THOSE SUFFERING FROM NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS). (B) THE PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (D) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY DEEMS APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CROSBY HALL
BACK LANE
CROSBY
LIVERPOOL
L23 4UA
- Phone:
- 01519248590
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window