ONE WORLD LINK (WARWICK DISTRICT - BO DISTRICT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One World Link promotes friendship between the communities of Bo District in Sierra Leone and Warwick District in the UK. The link has been active since 1981. It is inspired by a desire for justice, equality, human understanding and mutual support. Activities include exchange visits, cultural events, links between schools and other community organisations, social gatherings, pen friendships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
82 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 October 1988: Standard registration
- OWL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ATKINS | Chair | 29 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Nnedi Ojiugo Dede-Konkwo | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Raymond Western | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Johannes Mallah Jr | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Paul Wood | Trustee | 04 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELENA WHITE | Trustee | 04 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alan Hall | Trustee | 30 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Phil Clarke | Trustee | 29 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH LOUISE GARRETT | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARCHER | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARGARET KNIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN JOHN MOSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER WARR | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR CHRIS KING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.21k | £12.84k | £11.83k | £13.54k | £20.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.33k | £7.07k | £23.59k | £16.68k | £20.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JULY 1988 as amended on 02 Mar 2019 as amended on 02 Feb 2021 as amended on 02 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN LINKS BETWEEN BO DISTRICT SIERRA LEONE AND WARWICK DISTRICT UK, WITH THE AIN OF ADVANCING EDUCATION AND IMPROVING FACILITIES FOR HEALTH CARE AND OTHER COMMUNITY PURPOSES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE (SUCH AS ALLEVIATING POVERTY) IN THE BO DISTRICT AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF DEVELOPMENT EDUCATION IN THE WARWICK DISTRICT BY SUCH MEANS AS SHALL BE SO CALCULATED TO ACHIEVE THIS AIN FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE SAID DISTRICTS.
Area of benefit
BO DISTRICT, SIERRA LEONE AND WARWICK DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
122 Brunswick Street
LEAMINGTON SPA
Warwickshire
CV31 2EN
- Phone:
- 07711850120
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window