YSGOL CROES ATTI, FLINT PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING THROUGH SMALL EVENTS SUCH AS CAKE SALES OR SPONSERED WALKS, AND SUMMER AND CHRISTMAS FAIRS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Liverpool City
- Wrexham
Governance
- 21 November 1988: Standard registration
- 09 June 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 September 2019: Re-registered
- 17 May 2021: Funds received from 519495 SHOTTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- 16 February 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- YSGOL CROES ATTI PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £930 | £2.26k | £1.83k | £1.29k | £1.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.11k | £1.57k | £1.31k | £859 | £1.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2021 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 20 SEPTEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window