Financial history THE LLANDUDNO YOUTH MUSIC THEATRE

Charity number: 701723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.37k £7.40k £34.16k £20.95k £38.76k
Total expenditure £6.20k £4.81k £41.66k £33.02k £37.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £650 N/A £500 £500 £1.00k