Financial history BELGRAVE PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 701864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.97k £4.58k £8.92k £11.48k £5.99k
Total expenditure £9.98k £718 £2.85k £9.31k £847
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A