Financial history TYDFIL TRAINING CONSORTIUM LIMITED

Charity Number: 702622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.43m £1.39m £2.09m £1.69m £2.11m
Total expenditure £1.26m £1.20m £1.84m £1.65m £1.84m
Income from government contracts £97.10k N/A N/A N/A £1.77m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £296.71k £367.40k £295.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £33.00k £15.00k £26.00k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.38m £1.36m £2.07m £1.67m £2.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £34.00k
Income - Other £44.80k £0 £0 £0 £11.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.20m £1.84m £1.65m £1.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £53.55k £0 £0 £0 £0