LEICESTER ISLAMIC ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PURPOSE FOR WHICH THIS TRUST IS ESTABLISHED IS THE FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF ALL PUPILS IN ATTENDANCE AT THE LEICESTER ISLAMIC ACADEMY AND OTHER SUCH SCHOOLS ESTABLISHED AND MAINTAINED FOR THIS PURPOSE AND INCLUDING THERE AT THE PROMOTION OF THE TEACHING OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE QURAN AND THE TEACHINGS OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMED (PEACE BE UPON HIM)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£1,198,787
Donations and legacies | £1.15m | |
Charitable activities | £3.01k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £49.99k |
Total expenditure:
£1,101,933
Raising funds | £1.05m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other | £54.86k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.10m | |
Charitable expenditure | £0 | |
Retained for future use | £96.85k |
People

67 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 20 March 1990: Standard registration
- LEICESTER ISLAMIC ACADEMY (Working name)
- MUSLIM GIRLS HIGH SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Musa Suleman | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Dr MOHAMED HUSSEIN MUKADAM | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|||||||
ANWAR PATAS | Trustee | 28 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
ABDULHAQ PATEL | Trustee | 28 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
HUSSEIN SULEMAN | Trustee | 28 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
AYUB MAHOMED | Trustee | 28 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
Mohammed ASHRAF MAKADAM | Trustee |
|
||||||||
IQBAL DESAI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £898.70k | £1.28m | £874.49k | £1.06m | £1.20m | |
|
Total expenditure | £839.81k | £829.56k | £823.57k | £1.00m | £1.10m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £143.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £105.44k | £408.44k | £874.49k | £9.19k | £1.15m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.84k | £5.86k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £749.43k | £696.80k | £0 | £999.39k | £3.01k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £40.00k | £173.49k | £0 | £49.99k | £49.99k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £27.91k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £785.10k | £783.79k | £0 | £940.39k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £3.20k | £0 | £0 | £1.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £3.00k | £0 | £3.30k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £54.71k | £42.56k | £823.57k | £60.62k | £54.86k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.95m | £2.92m | £2.89m | £2.89m | £2.86m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £289.31k | £258.02k | £333.39k | £466.27k | £579.59k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £577.96k | £60.67k | £57.52k | £128.70k | £114.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 13 July 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 13 July 2022 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 8 DECEMBER 1989 AND DEEDS OF AMENDMENT DATED 10 MARCH 2002 AND 21 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE FOR WHICH THIS TRUST IS ESTABLISHED IS THE FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF ALL PUPILS IN ATTENDANCE AT THE LEICESTER ISLAMIC ACADEMY AND OTHER SUCH SCHOOLS ESTABLISHED AND MAINTAINED FOR THIS PURPOSE AND INCLUDING THEREAT THE PROMOTION OF THE TEACHING OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE QURAN AND THE DOCTRINES ON WHICH IT RESTS AND THE OBSERVANCES THAT SERVE TO PROMOTE AND MANIFEST IT, AND THE TEACHINGS OF THE SUNNI (WAY) OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMED (PEACE BE UPON HIM) ACCORDING TO THE HADITH AS CONTAINED IN THE SAHIH AL-BHUKHARI AND THE SAHIH MUSLIM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leicester Islamic Academy
320 London Road
Leicester
LE2 2PJ
- Phone:
- 0116 2705343
- Email:
- admin@lia.uk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window