Financial history YOUTH TRUST (GRANTHAM)

Charity Number: 703185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.98k £2.54k £3.27k £2.98k £3.20k
Total expenditure £1.27k £708 £2 £1.87k £2.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A