Family Holiday Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of holidays for disadvantaged families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,095,526
Donations and legacies | £2.08m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £9.35k | |
Other | £11.05k |
Total expenditure:
£1,658,637
Raising funds | £459.19k | |
Charitable activities | £1.20m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £487,511 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £459.19k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.20m | |
Retained for future use | £436.89k |
People

13 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- FHA (Working name)
- THE FAMILY HOLIDAY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Anne Harris | Chair | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Ben Leet | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saket Jasoria | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Mark Reeves | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Eirene Cross | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Davinia Batley | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giulia Maria Said | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
INGRID BUSSELL | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hills | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dawn Tucker | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jaqueline Ann Kerslake | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Montague Appleby | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.91m | £1.93m | £719.55k | £1.77m | £2.10m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50m | £1.20m | £1.31m | £2.26m | £1.66m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £933.88k | £487.51k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.90m | £1.85m | £717.11k | £1.77m | £2.08m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.75k | £8.27k | £2.44k | £4.19k | £9.35k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £73.63k | £0 | £0 | £11.05k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £500.80k | £1.09m | £143.94k | £20.23k | £890.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.19m | £639.20k | £928.61k | £1.72m | £1.20m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £303.30k | £562.99k | £376.69k | £540.02k | £459.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.77k | £23.44k | £20.64k | £16.64k | £17.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £301.54k | £230.65k | £172.70k | £19.04k | £106.17k | |
|
Long-term investments | £127.52k | £130.48k | £137.18k | £122.46k | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £845.26k | £1.72m | £1.13m | £788.39k | £1.29m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £34.38k | £112.56k | £48.86k | £37.31k | £67.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUL 2017 as amended on 30 Nov 2018 as amended on 24 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
“The objects of the Charity are to promote and provide access to holidays and day trips for families or members of families which or who have need of such holidays or day trips for rest and recreation by reason of their youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage.”
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Family Holiday Charity
Unit A
Arc House
82 Tanner Street
LONDON
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 02031170650
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window