HORNSBY HOUSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 800284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Principal activity is the provision of a non-selective day school education for boys and girls aged 4 and 11 years.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HORNSBY HOUSE SCHOOL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Corinne Aldridge Chair 31 January 2017
TROJANS SCHEME
Received: On time
Polly Katrina Fraley Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
Enyimnaya Nwosu Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
Sameer Tanna Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
DAVID SMITH Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record
Andrew Winston Skinnard Trustee 16 November 2015
None on record
Neil Newman Trustee 17 March 2014
None on record
Mandy Brown Trustee 23 January 2014
mySociety
Received: On time
HUW DAVIES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.08m £6.64m £6.90m £7.71m £8.40m
Total expenditure £6.07m £6.03m £6.50m £7.17m £7.50m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £19.59k £10.71k £9.15k £20.77k £25.96k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £8.87k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £7.04m £6.62m £6.86m £7.59m £8.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.36k £12.66k £565 £3 £85.21k
Income - Other £0 £0 £27.98k £105.52k £28.84k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.06m £6.02m £6.50m £7.17m £7.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.31k £8.87k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.40k £9.50k £8.40k £9.00k £9.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £17.19k £20.96k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £5.94m £7.02m £6.91m £6.60m £6.41m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £5.40m £4.49m £5.45m £6.43m £7.25m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.04m £1.59m £2.01m £2.14m £1.87m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 July 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 17 July 2023 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 November 2021 127 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HORNSBY HOUSE SCHOOL
HEARNVILLE ROAD
LONDON
SW12 8RS
Phone:
02086754325