Financial history ST MARY'S SCHOOL ASCOT CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 800450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £535.41k £229.78k £162.05k £302.66k £281.79k
Total expenditure £175.24k £314.68k £254.83k £189.62k £237.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £393.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £142.41k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £152.47k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.76k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £22.76k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A