ERITREAN RELIEF ASSOCIATION U K

Charity number: 800543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising activities to meet demands led charitable projects in Eritrea have been our priority. Currently the two main projects are i) in support of children and schools for the visually and hearing impaired, and ii) in support of education of students through the provision of suitable electronic devices.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £7,590
Total expenditure: £12,492

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Eritrea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 December 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ERA-UK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SEBLE EPHREM Chair
None on record
Mebrak Ghebreweldi Trustee
THE SUSSEX COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
YOHANNES FASSIL Trustee
None on record
HABTOM TESFAY Trustee
None on record
TESFALDET WOLDEGHIORGHIS GHILAZGI Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.07k £5.64k £4.36k £2.15k £7.59k
Total expenditure £2.37k £2.03k £11.66k £10.29k £12.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 14 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 June 2024 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 10 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 March 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Suite 112
275 New North Road
N1 7AA
Phone:
07752538519