CHILDREN'S HEART SUPPORT NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 1988 the Children's Heart Support Network is run entirely by voluntary help and donations. The Children's Heart Support Network aims to support children with heart disorders and their families whilst they undergo the traumas of discovery of a heart problem and subsequent surgery or other treatment, on-going permanent problems, or, sadly, sometimes bereavement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- WESSEX CHILDREN'S HEART CIRCLE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.81k | £5.50k | £5.16k | £5.53k | £43 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.69k | £8.45k | £4.77k | £1.33k | £9.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 26 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 28 March 2015 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 24 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 18 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/01/1989 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/1990 AS AMENDED ON 15/05/1993 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/1994 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/1998 AS AMENDED ON 22/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM HEART DISEASE AND ALLIED CONDITONS WHO ARE PATIENTS OR FORMER PATIENTS OF THE CARDIO- THORACIC UNIT SOUTHAMPTON GENERAL HOSPITAL, IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPORT OF THE FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON GENERAL HOSPITAL'S CATCHMENT AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window