Financial history SOUTH LONDON SINGERS

Charity Number: 800934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.15k £70 £14.88k £16.11k £12.51k
Total expenditure £9.49k £20 £15.15k £16.56k £15.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A