ACTION FOR STAMMERING CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a free specialist assessment service to children and young adults who stammer from any part of the UK and a full training programme for therapists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 March 1989: Standard registration
- A R S C (Working name)
- THE ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH INTO STAMMERING IN CHILDHOOD (Previous name)
- THE MICHAEL PALIN CENTRE FOR STAMMERING CHILDREN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Jane Roberts | Chair | 20 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher David Smith | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Archna Rahulan | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen McAteer | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Carver | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Baker | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zain Ghani | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Allen | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lowton | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Leach | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Anya Paul | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Murray | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £618.94k | £602.10k | £528.00k | £388.28k | £208.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £600.29k | £428.87k | £324.04k | £305.58k | £311.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £615.66k | £598.28k | £523.52k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £2.01k | £3.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £469 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.81k | £1.81k | £1.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £3.00k | £10.00k | £67.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £503.84k | £377.25k | £262.85k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £96.44k | £51.62k | £61.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.24k | £3.74k | £7.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £343.80k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/12/1988 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/03/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/01/2014
Charitable objects
(I) TO RELIEVE CHILDREN WHO SUFFER FROM STAMMERING AND (II) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE MEANS BY WHICH STAMMERING MAY BE PREVENTED AND TREATED AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Michael Palin Centre
13-15 Pine Street
LONDON
EC1R 0JG
- Phone:
- 02033168113
- Email:
- info@stammeringchildren.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window