THE EVANGELICAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH IN ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Presbytery assists its congregations in spiritual and temporal affairs. The Presbytery furthers the Gospel of Christ in England and wales, and overseas. The Presbytery gives material and spiritual aid to the needy in England and Wales and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Germany
- Sweden
Governance
- 14 August 1989: Standard registration
- EPCEW (Working name)
- EVANGELICAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH IN ENGLAND AND WALES (Working name)
- PRESBYTERAN ASSOCIATION IN ENGLAND (PAE) (Working name)
- PRESBYTERIAN ASSOCIATION IN ENGLAND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthew Thomas Faux | Chair | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Thomas George Hutchings | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Falko Pieter Drijfhout | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Stephen Johnston | Trustee | 14 August 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Donald John MacLean | Trustee | 07 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.93k | £22.11k | £18.70k | £38.02k | £20.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.56k | £55.20k | £14.38k | £23.45k | £54.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 11TH JULY 1989, AS AMENDED ON 16 OCTOBER 2001 AND 7 MARCH 2009 BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 3 OCTOBER 2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SUPPORTING THE WORK AND OUTREACH OF ITS MEMBER CHURCHES AND FELLOWSHIPS WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR AS LONG AS THESE CHURCHES ADHERE TO THE HISTORIC CHRISTIAN FAITH AS DEFINED BY THE WESTMINSTER CONFESSION AND CATECHISM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Naunton Lane EPC Church Building
23 Naunton Lane
Cheltenham
GL53 7BJ
- Phone:
- 07929527631
- Email:
- clerk@epcew.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window