Trustees GREENWICH MENCAP

Charity number: 802103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Pearlgood Chair 24 November 2015
None on record
Madeliene Lehane Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Sharon Hutton Trustee 06 December 2024
BEXLEY CROSSROADS CARE LIMITED
Received: On time
Laura Smyth Trustee 25 November 2023
None on record
Timothy Symth Trustee 25 November 2023
None on record
Jonathan Sellars Trustee 30 March 2020
None on record