Accounts and annual returns THE OCTAGON TRUST FUND (FOR JAMES GIBB'S OCTAGON AND ORLEANS HOUSE GALLERY,TWICKENHAM)

Charity number: 802185
Charity reporting is overdue by 1758 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 297 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 297 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 663 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 663 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1028 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1028 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1393 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1393 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1758 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1758 days