THE QUEEN ELIZABETH SCHOLARSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 802557
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Granting craft scholarships On 1st September 2013 the Charity passed all its assets ( and liabilities) to Queen Elizabeth Scholarship Trust Limited, Charity Number1152032. This succeeding Charity continued the activities of the original Charity (Number 802557)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 December 1989: Standard registration
  • 01 March 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 01 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1152032 QUEEN ELIZABETH SCHOLARSHIP TRUST LIMITED
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £192.00k £957.36k £1.44m £187.28k £0
Total expenditure £258.06k £429.10k £549.15k £357.35k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £760.37k £1.12m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £116.14k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £196.99k £201.80k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £233.18k £399.30k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £28.67k £23.41k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £302.30k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £2.48k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 08 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 18 September 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 30 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 21 July 2014 On Time