Financial history THE STOWMARKET RELIEF TRUST

Charity Number: 802572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £80.55k £76.35k £96.46k £85.04k £89.75k
Total expenditure £54.02k £75.12k £88.99k £85.24k £47.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.75k N/A £10.00k £18.00k £30.00k