RAYMOND LULL MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity as contained in the Trust Deed is to advance the Christian faith amongst Muslims with it's activities being largely educational as embodied in the work of Raymond Lull.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
- France
Governance
- 29 June 1990: Standard registration
- 13 June 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 13 June 2024: Funds transferred to 219946 UFM WORLDWIDE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/09/2018 | 23/09/2019 | 23/09/2020 | 23/09/2021 | 23/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.51k | £11.77k | £3.10k | £752 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £5.00k | £19.25k | £752 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 23 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 23 September 2022 | 18 May 2024 | 300 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 September 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 September 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 September 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS BRIEFLY EMBODIED IN THE SCHEDULE OF THE DEED AMONGST MOSLENS WORLDWIDE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window