Financial history COMEYTROWE COMMUNITY HALL

Charity Number: 900119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £30.38k £32.77k £28.10k £34.66k £37.37k
Total expenditure £24.29k £15.37k £18.80k £28.10k £30.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £20.27k £3.05k N/A N/A