TAUNTON AND SOMERSET MUSIC AND DRAMA FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual festival of music both vocal and instrumental and speech and drama and dance and film Competitions for Young Musicians, Vocalists, Musical Theatre Singers, Actors. Somerset Song Prize Competition
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Devon
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 July 1990: Standard registration
- 18 July 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 July 2018: Funds transferred to 1179098 TAUNTON FESTIVAL O F THE ARTS
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2013 | 28/02/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.62k | £23.21k | £10.56k | £56.29k | £32.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.36k | £25.31k | £12.66k | £54.95k | £24.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 23 May 2018 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 23 May 2018 | 23 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 27 September 2017 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 27 September 2017 | 150 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 14TH FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE GENERALLY AND BY MEANS OF THE COMPETITION FESTIVAL MOVEMENT IN PARTICULAR THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS OF MUSIC DANCE ELOCUTION LITERATURE AND ACTING IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES. (II) TO BE AFFILIATED TO THE BRITISH FEDERATION OF MUSIC FESTIVALS AND TO CARRY OUT AS FAR AS POSSIBLE THE OBJECTS OF THE SAID FEDERATION. (III) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCTIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window