THE SOLENT DOLPHIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve persons suffering from mental or physical disabilities and those accompanying them, by the provision of facilities for recreational or other leisure time occupation and in particular, by the provision of pleasure boat trips for such persons
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 July 1990: Standard registration
- THE ALISON MACGREGOR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Louise Oakley | Chair | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Arthur Taylor | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicholas John Jefferey | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Chalkley | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Michael Stephens | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM Albert Reginald MUNT | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BLAIR MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN CHARLES OAKLEY ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN SHAW DUNCAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.66k | £14.03k | £35.61k | £26.19k | £31.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.88k | £13.56k | £19.09k | £24.92k | £37.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 30TH JUNE 1989 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 1ST MAY 1990 AND 13 SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION OF PLEASURE BOAT TRIPS FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Solent Dolphin Ltd
Numeric Accounting Ltd
Mountbatten House
Grosvenor Sqaure
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 2JU
- Phone:
- 07770 565299
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window