Financial history MARLBOROUGH ST MARY'S AND ST PETER'S SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity number: 1000333
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £10.00k £0 £25.00k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £3.42k £0 £7.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A