Financial history MORTHYNG LIMITED

Charity number: 1000381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.07m £2.70m £2.81m £3.27m £3.22m
Total expenditure £2.92m £2.54m £2.61m £2.66m £2.62m
Income from government contracts £2.94m £2.69m £2.73m £3.16m £3.12m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.07m £2.70m £2.78m £3.24m £3.12m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £27.92k £93.43k
Income - Other £0 £109 £28.72k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.92m £2.54m £2.61m £2.66m £2.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.71k £7.93k £0 £8.40k £8.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0