Financial history THE FRIENDS OF EGGESFORD ALL SAINTS TRUST

Charity number: 1000535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.71k £2.09k £6.32k £7.59k £3.80k
Total expenditure £5.13k £3.37k £5.32k £2.55k £3.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A