Trustees THE FRIENDS OF EGGESFORD ALL SAINTS TRUST

Charity number: 1000535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW MILLWARD Chair 06 February 2013
None on record
Amanda Rowena Satchell Trustee 21 May 2024
THE MOORLAND MOUSIE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Deborah Rose Bartlett Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Deborah Mary Phillips Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
JONATHAN CROFTS Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
Sara Penelhum Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record
Christopher Richard Rogers Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record
James William Bulmer Trustee 02 October 2019
None on record
Jan E Bulmer Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
RODNEY DAVIES Trustee
None on record
MR NIGEL SKINNER Trustee
None on record
EDWARD JOHN HOWELL Trustee
None on record