Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST NICHOLAS CASTLE HEDINGHAM

Charity number: 1000780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £8.84k £11.32k £1.81k £7.20k £13.49k
Total expenditure £22.88k £11.72k £1.33k £3.89k £15.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A