Financial history AFTER ADOPTION

Charity number: 1000888
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £3.28m £4.21m £4.86m £4.85m £4.95m
Total expenditure £3.29m £4.26m £5.22m £4.80m £4.84m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £2.95m £2.87m £3.58m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £760.93k £1.09m £361.58k
Income - Donations and legacies £155.37k £105.59k £91.44k £181.05k £169.39k
Income - Other trading activities £89.08k £50.53k £48.90k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.92m £3.94m £4.51m £4.60m £4.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £425 £533 £653 £629 £215
Income - Other £115.49k £115.20k £211.31k £70.61k £164.86k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.99m £4.00m £4.92m £4.68m £4.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £120.26k £122.05k
Expenditure - Governance £72.88k £76.59k £84.76k £90.96k £113.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0