Governing document AFTER ADOPTION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD OCTOBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 FEBRUARY 1992 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 FEBRUARY 1992. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 2ND JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
*****IN ADMINISTRATION ***** TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE SUPPORT RELIEF AND CARE OF CHILDREN IN NEED WHO ARE PLACED OR TO BE PLACED FOR ADOPTION OR FOSTERING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.