Trustees HAMPSHIRE BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1000995

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter George | Chair | 13 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Dylan Gussman | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cooper | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Baxter | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|||||
David Holloway | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Ali Everest | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Latham | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ray | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Grimes | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Skinner | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Frost | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jan Margetts | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.