Financial history THE ECA/M A STOTHERS EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1001542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.63k £11.55k £14.65k £17.90k £51.91k
Total expenditure £3.97k £0 £0 £8.06k £4.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A