Financial history COPPICE MISSION CHURCH

Charity number: 1001741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.49k £13.51k £20.78k £37.62k £44.18k
Total expenditure £34.21k £47.01k £25.35k £58.45k £77.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A