Financial history HOLLYTREE COMMUNITY PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1002072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £67.12k £69.28k £60.70k £87.42k £154.94k
Total expenditure £62.35k £63.60k £64.98k £77.55k £80.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £630 £1.27k £650