Financial history FLAMSTEED MARK LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1002177
Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £408 £335 £721 £582 £280
Total expenditure £300 £22 £30 £415 £250
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A