Financial history THE SCHUBERT ENSEMBLE TRUST

Charity number: 1002244
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £10.85k £1.66k £30 £102 £24
Total expenditure £25.31k £2.96k £159 £5.38k £5.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A