Financial history THE CORNELIUS TRUST

Charity number: 1002371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £63.43k £48.21k £58.11k £68.93k £64.33k
Total expenditure £82.31k £41.63k £55.87k £59.74k £57.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A