HINDU CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (WALES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide central focus for pan-Indian cultural promotion and promoting values amongst the Indian and indigenous population with view to improving relationship and understanding, thereby reducing inequality, discrimination and disadvantage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £7,034 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 17 April 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sunaina Purbey | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarita Pawar | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kanya Kumari Podila | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hari Ganesh Samayamanthula | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nirmala Kumar | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr POONAM SINGHAL | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Versha Sood | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Seshakiran Chemudipati | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.88k | £121.95k | £54.78k | £50.55k | £89.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.12k | £56.75k | £50.66k | £55.15k | £82.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.28k | £50.00k | £2.00k | £2.37k | £7.03k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAR 1991 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUN 2001 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUL 2017 as amended on 10 Jun 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF HINDU RELIGION AND PHILOSOPHY (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONGST THE HINDU COMMUNITY RESIDENT IN WALES
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
The India Centre
Sanquhar Street
CARDIFF
CF24 2AA
- Phone:
- 07814504892
- Email:
- poosinghal@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window