Governing document HINDU CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (WALES)
Charity number: 1002569

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAR 1991 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUN 2001 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 23 JUL 2017 as amended on 10 Jun 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF HINDU RELIGION AND PHILOSOPHY (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONGST THE HINDU COMMUNITY RESIDENT IN WALES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WALES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.