Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF ALFORD AND MABLETHORPE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1002607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.20k £3.87k £6.58k £14.40k £17.40k
Total expenditure £14.01k £4.36k £7.48k £14.78k £17.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A