Financial history THE FOLLY FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1002646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £20.27k £16.79k £115.91k £17.14k £155.67k
Total expenditure £17.98k £21.18k £10.47k £18.34k £18.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A