Financial history THE PARK LANE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1002697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £236.55k £333.54k £212.20k £1.07m £402.90k
Total expenditure £209.41k £275.40k £186.35k £286.37k £344.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £860.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £214.56k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £280.02k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £6.35k N/A