AVANTE CARE AND SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1002727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Residential, Respite, Nursing & Day Care for older people, specialising in dementia care. Domiciliary care for older people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bexley
  • Greenwich
  • Kent
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 May 1991: Standard registration
  • 30 October 2012: Funds received from 1080820 CARE PARTNERS TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • KCHT (Working name)
  • AVANTE PARTNERSHIP LIMITED (Previous name)
  • KENT COMMUNITY HOUSING TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Patrick Ireland Chair 01 August 2018
CALDECOTT FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Caroline Hallett Trustee 25 February 2025
None on record
Adeyemi Oyewumi Trustee 25 February 2025
None on record
Louise Nylander Trustee 25 February 2025
None on record
Caroline Kaiser Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
William Purvis Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
Professor Peter Bannister Trustee 29 March 2023
PIP PARENTS INFORMATION PORTAL
Received: On time
Rasheed Ahmad Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
Sureshraj Anandraj Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Stephen Anson King Trustee 22 September 2020
None on record
Peter William Gingell Trustee 22 September 2020
None on record
Gill Gibb Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.16m £31.60m £30.80m £32.64m £44.54m
Total expenditure £27.90m £30.18m £29.05m £30.88m £37.04m
Income from government contracts £14.58m £16.46m £17.17m £17.33m £20.36m
Income from government grants N/A £2.91m £1.87m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £51.98k £21.79k £21.09k £25.13k £6.83m
Income - Other trading activities £69.29k £4.07k £8.55k £52.89k £27.57k
Income - Charitable activities £28.42m £28.63m £28.84m £32.55m £37.40m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £42.97k £3.24k £8.76k £0 £229.18k
Income - Other £2.58m £7.30k £1.93m £5.37k £54.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £27.90m £30.18m £29.05m £30.88m £37.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £570.96k £498.58k £518.55k £518.55k £328.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £60.35m £62.78m £62.67m £63.27m £70.22m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £10.73m £8.60m £9.54m £9.35m £19.81m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£3.63m -£2.80m -£1.65m -£1.12m -£1.07m
Total liabilities £15.15m £14.23m £13.27m £12.25m £13.05m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DE GELSEY HOUSE
1 JUBILEE WAY
FAVERSHAM
KENT
ME13 8GD
Phone:
01795597400