Financial history BASICS LONDON (NORTH EAST METROPOLITAN ACCIDENT UNIT)

Charity number: 1002819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £299 £90 £13 £219 £1.21k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £2.20k £97 £195
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A