Financial history The International Association for the Study of Arabia

Charity number: 1003272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.01k £10.12k £11.03k £3.54k £28.50k
Total expenditure £20.06k £10.98k £6.81k £3.96k £7.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A