THE NOTABLE CLUB

Charity number: 1003504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Notable Club promotes and facilitates social activity for disabled people from 16 to 60 years of age

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £17,971
Total expenditure: £12,238

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 July 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NOTABLE CLUB (Previous name)
  • THE NOTABLE CLUB (MINI BUS APPEAL) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY TABRETT Chair
None on record
Christian Schuhmacher Trustee 16 May 2024
None on record
Catherine Potter Trustee 28 October 2021
None on record
Shaun Jennings Trustee 28 October 2021
None on record
Diana Irene Rudge Trustee 21 May 2015
None on record
DINA PATRICIA DRAKE PARKER Trustee
EMMANUEL CHURCH WSM
Received: On time
BELINDA RICE Trustee
None on record
NICOLA HOCKING Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.29k £0 £4.78k £15.71k £17.97k
Total expenditure £11.37k £0 £8.33k £9.33k £12.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
101 Manor Farm Crescent
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Avon
BS24 9XF
Phone:
01934613701
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available