Financial history RIVERSIDE FAMILY CHURCH

Charity number: 1003598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £74.31k £68.18k £72.84k £75.89k £68.90k
Total expenditure £73.92k £93.31k £67.53k £75.66k £76.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A