Financial history THE BERKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITY

Charity number: 1003788
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £96.39k £71.61k £77.50k £82.00k £100.56k
Total expenditure £120.94k £60.69k £86.45k £94.34k £74.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A